Gilberg, Steven Matthew (CPSO#: 53955)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Of Ottawa
Eye Institute
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8834
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Steven Gilberg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gilberg ( CPSO# 53955 )

Business Address:
University of Ottawa
Eye Institute
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8834

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 14 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEVEN MATTHEW GILBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILBERG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1988