Gilbert, Sebastien (CPSO#: 70307)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Sep 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Division of Thoracic Surgery
Suite 6363
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 7 4033
Fax: (613) 737-8668
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sebastien Gilbert Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 12 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gilbert ( CPSO# 70307 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
Division of Thoracic Surgery
6363 - 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SEBASTIEN GILBERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILBERT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2009