Gill, Harmeet Singh (CPSO#: 82591)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Apr 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Apr 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Eye Face Institute
4789 Yonge St., Suite 316
North York ON  M2N 0G3
Phone: 1-888-883-7503
Fax: 647-797-0224
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Harmeet S. Gill Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Gill ( CPSO# 82591 )

Business Address:
Suite 316
4789 Yonge Street
North York ON  M2N 0G3
Phone Number: (416) 224-5551

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HARMEET SINGH GILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2012