Gill, Kulwant Singh (CPSO#: 64274)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Punjabi University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1380 Regent Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Z4
Phone: (705) 523-1550
Fax: (705) 523-1542
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kulwant Gill Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 13 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kaur ( CPSO# 85755 )
Dr. K. Gill ( CPSO# 64274 )

Business Address:
1380 Regent Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Z4
Phone Number: (705) 523-1550

Business Address:
Sudbury Regional Hospital
Laurentian Site
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1


Corporation Name: R. Kaur Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 28 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kaur ( CPSO# 85755 )
Dr. K. Gill ( CPSO# 64274 )

Business Address:
Sudbury Regional Hospital
Laurentian Site
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 522-2200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematological Pathology Effective: 16 Dec 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 19 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KULWANT SINGH GILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1991