Gill, Randeep Singh (CPSO#: 92665)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Apr 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 21 Apr 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Ravi Shankar University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Activecare Medical Clinic
2121 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A1H2
Phone: 613-761-6777
Fax: (613) 761-7744
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Strandhered Crossing Medical Cenre
Suite 305
3161 Strandherd Drive
Ottawa ON  K2J 4V1
Canada
Phone: 613-823-7766
Fax: 613-823-0063
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Randeep Gill Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 23 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Gill ( CPSO# 92665 )

Business Address:
2121 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 1H2
Phone Number: (613) 761-6777

Business Address:
Strandherd Crossing Medical Centre
Suite 305
3161 Strandherd Drive
Ottawa ON  K2J 5N1
Phone Number: (613) 228-2020

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Indiana

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Apr 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 Oct 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 20 Oct 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 15 Sep 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 15 Sep 2011 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Randeep Singh Gill may practise medicine independently in family medicine,
            only.