Gill, Sonja (CPSO#: 100131)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 412
3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Phone: (289) 863-7422
Fax: 9058158988
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Canada
Phone: 9058132200
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Gill Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 10 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gill ( CPSO# 100131)

Business Address:
412 - 3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Phone Number: (289) 863-7422

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 06 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SONJA GILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 20 May 2013 to 15 Jun 2013
Elective Trainee - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 May 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015