Gillies, Judy Roxanne Marie (CPSO#: 72460)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Sep 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Sep 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
101 Mall Suite 208
38 Pine Street North
Timmins ON  P4N 6K6
Phone: (705) 264-1881
Fax: (705) 267-4212
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Judy Gillies Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 10 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Gillies ( CPSO# 72460 )

Business Address:
Suite 208
38 Pine Street North
Timmins ON  P4N 6K6
Phone Number: (705) 267-3272

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Aug 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JUDY ROXANNE MARIE GILLIES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILLIES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 24 Oct 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 25 Oct 1999 to 27 Aug 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Aug 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2000