Gillis, Lisa Anne (CPSO#: 72670)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Woodlands Medical Centre
40 Shellington Place
Suite 204
Brantford ON  N3S 0C5
Phone: 519-759-6116
Fax: 519-759-7727
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lisa Gillis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 18 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Gillis ( CPSO# 72670 )

Business Address:
North Woodlands Medical Centre
204 - 40 Shellington Place
Brantford ON  N3S 0C5
Phone Number: (519) 759-6116

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Dec 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISA ANNE GILLIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILLIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2015