Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Ginzburg, Brian Michael (CPSO#: 57536)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6186
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

York Radiology Consultants
Suite 100
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Canada
Phone: (416) 494-8800
Fax: (416) 494-9257
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

North York General Hosptial
Branson Division
555 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M2R 1N5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. B Ginzburg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 22 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Ginzburg ( CPSO# 57536 )

Business Address:
York Radiology Consultants
Suite 100
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone Number: (416) 494-8800

Business Address:
1100 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2K 2W1
Phone Number: (416) 494-8800

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6186

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
Branson Division
555 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M2R 1N5
Phone Number: (416) 756-6186

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 27 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN MICHAEL GINZBURG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GINZBURG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1986