Ginzburg, Val Eliezer (CPSO#: 83244)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Russian

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oak Ridges Endoscopy Centre
13291 Yonge Street Suite 400
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Phone: (905) 751-2930
Fax: (866) 643-9669
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Pharmasante
10815 Bathurst Srt Unit 23-24
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9Y2
Canada
Phone: (905) 780-1050
Fax: 905-780-1055
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

MSUCC
110 CopperCreek Dr #100
Markham ON  L6B 0P9
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

1235 Wilson Ave, Toronto, ON
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: V.E. Ginzburg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 24 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Ginzburg ( CPSO# 83244 )

Business Address:
OREC
13291 Yonge Street
Suite 400
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Phone Number: (905) 751-2930

Business Address:
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 494-2120

Business Address:
MSUCC
100 - 110 Coppercreek Drive
Markham ON  L6B 0P9

Business Address:
10815 Bathurst Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9Y2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VAL ELIEZER GINZBURG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GINZBURG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2007