Girgis, Ireen Makram Aziz (CPSO#: 85653)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Feb 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Feb 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cairo, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 6
10671 Chinguacousy Road
Brampton ON  L7A 0N5
Phone: (905) 840-4343
Fax: (905) 840-4303
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

305 Royal west drive
unit K
Brampton ON  L6X 5K8
Canada
Phone: (905) 452-0200
Fax: (905) 452-0212
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ireen Girgis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 18 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Girgis ( CPSO# 85653 )

Business Address:
305 Royalwest Drive
Suite K
Brampton ON  L6X 5K8
Phone Number: (905) 452-0200

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IREEN MAKRAM AZIZ GIRGIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIRGIS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2008