Girvan, David Pugsley (CPSO#: 20940)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 02 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Girvan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 8 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 16 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric General Surgery Effective: 22 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jan 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2014