Givari, Renee (CPSO#: 91947)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, French

Education:University of Queensland, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dr. Renee Givari Medical Clinic
171 Montreal Rd.
Suite 201
Cornwall ON  K6H 1B2
Phone: (613) 935-9485
Fax: (613) 935-5955
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Cornwall Community Hospital
840 McConnell,
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Canada
Phone: (613) 938-4240
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Givari Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 20 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Givari ( CPSO# 91947 )

Business Address:
201 - 171 Montreal Road
Cornwall ON  K6H 1B2
Phone Number: (613) 935-9485

Business Address:
Cornwall Community Hospital
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Phone Number: (613) 938-4240

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Jul 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RENEE GIVARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIVARI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2009 to 24 Oct 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Oct 2009 to 01 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Aug 2010 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2011 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2013