Given, John Patrick (CPSO#: 57047)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centre de santé communautaire de
l'Estrie, Pavillon Bourget
2081, rue Laval
Bourget ON  K0A 1E0
Phone: (613) 487-1802
Fax: (613) 487-4182
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Centre de santé communautaire de
l'Estrie, pavillon Embrun
738, rue Notre Dame
Embrun ON  K0A 1W1
Canada
Phone: (613) 443-3888
Fax: (613) 443-9519
County: County of Prescott and Russell
Electoral District: 07

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN PATRICK GIVEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIVEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1986 to 14 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1988