Gladstone, David Jay (CPSO#: 70117)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Aug 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Aug 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room A442
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4866
Fax: (416) 480-5753
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Jay Gladstone Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 07 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Gladstone ( CPSO# 70117 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Hospital
A-442
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4866

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID JAY GLADSTONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GLADSTONE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2003