Glancy, Graham David (CPSO#: 50019)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Manchester, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 3 - 4th Floor - Rm 471
1001 Queen St W
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. G. Glancy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 03 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Glancy ( CPSO# 50019 )

Business Address:
Unit 3-4, Room 471
1001 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone Number: (416) 236-5602

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 04 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GRAHAM DAVID GLANCY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GLANCY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1989