Glick, Leora Erin (CPSO#: 82406)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5th Floor
Suite 5C1020
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000 Ext. 43152
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Leora Glick Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 12 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Glick ( CPSO# 82406 )

Business Address:
5th Floor
Suite 5C1020
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEORA ERIN GLICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GLICK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2011