Glover, Benedict Martin (CPSO#: 90173)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jul 2015

Expiry Date:  01 May 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 30 Jul 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queens University
Department of Medicine
94 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone: (613) 533-2967
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 4G7
Canada
Phone: (613) 549-6666
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Hotel Dieu
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Canada
Phone: (613) 544-3400
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Benedict Glover Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 14 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Glover ( CPSO# 90173 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-3232

Business Address:
Queen's University - Department of Medicine
94 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone Number: (613) 533-2967

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 30 Jul 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 09 Jan 2009 to 21 Mar 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 22 Mar 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Dec 2010
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Apr 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 01 May 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 07 Apr 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Benedict Martin Glover may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division of Cardiology, Queen's University, in which Dr. Glover
                        holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor,
                        and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Glover  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Glover's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Glover's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on July 30, 2015, and currently has an interim
                  expiry date of May 1, 2018.  The expiry date of this certificate may be
                  extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.