Glover, Christopher Andrew (CPSO#: 67939)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Apr 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Heart Institute
Suite 3406
40 Ruskin Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 696-7329
Fax: (613) 696-7126
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher A. Glover Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Glover ( CPSO# 67939 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 761-4119

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 14 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER ANDREW GLOVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GLOVER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2001