Goad, Ralph Frederick (CPSO#: 29428)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jul 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
P O Box 2030
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Phone: (519) 352-6400 Ext. 6084
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ralph F. Goad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Goad ( CPSO# 29428 )

Business Address:
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Phone Number: (519) 352-6401

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RALPH FREDERICK GOAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOAD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1977