Gobessi, Linda (CPSO#: 64558)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Aug 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Aug 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Geriatric Psychiatry
Community Services of Ottawa
Room 131Y
75 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Phone: (613) 562-0283
Fax: (613) 562-0259
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Linda Gobessi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 26 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Gobessi ( CPSO# 64558 )

Business Address:
Geriatric Psychiatry
Community Services of Ottawa
129Y-131Y - 75 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C7
Phone Number: (613) 562-0283

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINDA GOBESSI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOBESSI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1991