Goel, Gautam (CPSO#: 103702)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mt. Sinai Hospital
Emergency Department
600 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: 416-586-5058
Fax: 416-586-4719
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gautam Goel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 23 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Goel ( CPSO# 103702)

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Emergency Department
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-5058

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GAUTAM GOEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOEL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2016