Goel, Rakesh (CPSO#: 43868)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Aug 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-7700 Ext. 70175
Fax: (613) 247-3511
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rakesh Goel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 28 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Goel ( CPSO# 43868 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-7700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 08 Sep 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAKESH GOEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOEL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1990