Goldberg, Norman Victor (CPSO#: 30720)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jun 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 16 May 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 300
18 Kensington Road
Brampton ON  L6T 4S5
Phone: (905) 791-3133
Fax: (905) 791-8441
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

110 Jozo Weider Blvd.
Collingwood ON  L9Y 3Z2
Canada
Phone: (705) 445-0231 Ext. 6471
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

87-d Westcreek Drive
Woodbridge ON  L4L 9N6
Canada
Phone: (905) 264-7160
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

3 VictoriaSt. East
Alliston ON  L9R 1T3
Canada
Phone: 705-434-9220
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

790 Burnhamthorpe St. West
Unit 12A
Mississauga ON  L5C 4G3
Canada
Phone: 647-972-6181
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

4504 Heathgate Cr.
Mississauga
Mississauga ON  L5R 2C4
Canada
Phone: 416-243-0000
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

43 Goldthorne
Etobicoke ON  M8Z 5S7
Canada
Phone: (647) 478-8953
Fax: 844-615-5262
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

308 Hurontario St.
Collingwood ON  L9Y 2M3
Canada
Phone: 1-866-938-4558
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

124 Ontario St.
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1M3
Canada
Phone: 705-888-8071
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

185 Mountview Road North
Georgetown ON  L7G 3P9
Canada
Phone: (905) 873-4907
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 May 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 16 May 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 16 May 2016 Active View Details [+]
            *As from August 18, 2016, Dr. Goldberg no longer requires his new/renewed
            prescriptions of controlled substances to be co-signed.  Therefore, he may
            issue new/renewed prescriptions for controlled substances at this time.*



            As from May 16, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Norman Victor
            Goldberg, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Goldberg
            to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")    

                                                of
                  
                                    DR. NORMAN VICTOR GOLDBERG
                                          ("Dr. Goldberg")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   I, Dr. Goldberg, certificate of registration number 30720, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            (2)   I, Dr. Goldberg, acknowledge that I am currently the subject of College
                  investigations.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (3)   I, Dr. Goldberg, understand and agree that I am bound by the terms of
                  this Undertaking from the date on which I sign it. 

            (4)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Goldberg, undertake to practice under the guidance of a
                        Clinical Supervisor, who is acceptable to the College (the
                        "Clinical Supervisor"), for twelve (12) months. 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Goldberg, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor, including,
                        at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitating the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP") attached as Appendix
                              "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Making recommendations to me for practice improvements;
                  
                        (iii) Making recommendations to me for ongoing professional
                              development.
                  
                        (iv)  For a minimum of one (1) month, commencing on the date the
                              Clinical Supervisor signs Appendix "A", meeting with me every
                              week to review a minimum of ten (10) to fifteen (15) of my
                              patient charts, discussing my care and treatment plan,
                              identify any concerns regarding the care and treatment plan
                              and making recommendations for improvement. The Clinical
                              Supervisor will report to the College on a monthly basis. 
                  
                        (v)   After the first month, and after the Clinical Supervisor has
                              met with me a minimum of four (4) times and the College has
                              received a minimum of one (1) report from the Clinical
                              Supervisor, the frequency of meetings between me and the
                              Clinical Supervisor can be reduced to bi-weekly, and the
                              Clinical Supervisor will continue to report to the College
                              monthly, if  the following conditions have been met, and only
                              after they are met:
                  
                              1.    The Clinical Supervisor recommends to the College that
                                    the frequency of meetings be reduced; and 
                  
                              2.    The College approves of the reduction in the frequency
                                    of the meetings. 
                  
                        (vi)  After four (4) months  of supervision, and after the Clinical
                              Supervisor has met with me for a minimum of ten (10) times,
                              and the College has received a minimum of four (4) reports
                              from the Clinical Supervisor, the frequency of meetings
                              between me and the Clinical Supervisor can be reduced to
                              monthly, and the Clinical Supervisor will continue to report
                              to the College every three (3) months, if the following
                              conditions have been met, and only after they are met:
                  
                              1.    The Clinical Supervisor recommends to the College that
                                    the frequency of meetings be reduced; and 
                  
                              2.    The College approves of the reduction in the frequency
                                    of the meetings. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Goldberg, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor based on the educational needs
                        identified in the IEP set out at Appendix "B" to my Undertaking, as
                        well as the areas of concern identified in the report of Dr. Hong
                        dated April 22, 2015, and concerns that may arise during the period
                        of supervision, as well as all charts where prescriptions for
                        substances referred to in paragraph B(5) were issued or renewed.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Goldberg, undertake to co-operate fully with the supervision
                        of my practice, conducted under this term of the Undertaking and
                        Appendix "A" attached, and to abide by the recommendations of my
                        Clinical Supervisor, including but not limited to, any recommended
                        practice improvements and ongoing professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Goldberg, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Goldberg, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its terms, I shall, within thirty
                        (30) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Goldberg, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the terms set out under subparagraphs B(4)(b) above,
                        I will cease prescribing narcotics and controlled substances, and
                        if after thirty (30) days I am unable to find a supervisor, I will
                        cease practicing medicine until such time as I have obtained a
                        Supervisor(s) acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Goldberg, agree that if I am required to cease practice as a
                        result of subparagraph B(4)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my Certificate of Registration and said
                        term, condition and limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (5)   Prescribing

                  (a)   Commencing on the date the Clinical Supervisor signs Appendix "A",
                        and for a period of 12 months thereafter, I, Dr. Goldberg,
                        undertake and agree that I will not issue new prescriptions or
                        renew existing prescriptions for any of the following substances,
                        unless the patient`s relevant clinical information and prescription
                        are reviewed, and the prescription has been co-signed, by a
                        Clinical Supervisor, acceptable to the College, prior to the
                        prescription being made available to the patient:
                  
                        (i)   Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
                              under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c.
                              19);
                  
                        (ii)  Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
                              made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C.,
                              1996, c. 19);
                  
                        (iii) Controlled Drugs (from Schedule G of the Regulations under
                              the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27); or
                  
                        (iv)  Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances (from the
                              Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations
                              made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C.,
                              1996, c. 19)
                  
                        (A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the
                        Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached hereto
                        as Schedule "A"; and the current regulatory lists are attached
                        hereto as Schedule "C")
                  
                  (b)   If, after one (1) month, the Clinical Supervisor recommends to the
                        College that the requirement for prior review and co-signing of
                        prescriptions can be removed, and the College approves the removal
                        of these requirements, then the Clinical Supervisor will not be
                        required to review and co-sign new prescriptions or renewals of
                        existing prescriptions prior to the prescriptions being made
                        available to the patient, but will continue to be required to do so
                        after each prescription has been issued or renewed, together with
                        the patient's relevant clinical information, to ensure that each
                        new prescription or renewal was appropriate. 
                  
            (6)   I, Dr. Goldberg, undertake to keep a copy of all prescriptions for
                  Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines
                  and Other Targeted Substances, in each patient chart.

            (7)   I, Dr. Goldberg, undertake to keep a log of all prescriptions for
                  Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines
                  and Other Targeted Substances, which will include at least the following
                  information:  

                        (i)   the date of the prescription;
                        (ii)  the name of the patient with chart / file number;
                        (iii) the name of the medication prescribed;
                        (iv)  the medication dosage;
                        (v)   the quantity prescribed;
                        (vi)  the clinical indication for use and patient direction; and
                        (vii) physician initials.
                  
            (8)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Goldberg, undertake that, approximately twelve (12) months
                        after the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in B(7)
                        above and Appendix "A" attached, I will submit to a Reassessment of
                        my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors
                        selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  The Reassessment may
                        include a chart review, direct observation of my care, interviews
                        with colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients and any
                        other tools deemed necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Goldberg, undertake to co-operate fully with the
                        Reassessment, conducted under this term of the Undertaking, and to
                        abide by the reasonable recommendations of the Assessor(s) that are
                        approved by the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Goldberg, acknowledge and agree that my Clinical Supervisor
                        may receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may
                        discuss with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from
                        the Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College.
                  
            (9)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Goldberg, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise including, but not limited to,
                        hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction
                        (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within fifteen (15) days
                        of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake
                        to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within
                        fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Goldberg, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the terms of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Goldberg, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan
                        ("OHIP"), the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics
                        Monitoring System ("NMS") implemented under the Narcotics Safety
                        and Awareness Act, 2010 and/or any person or institution who may
                        have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                        compliance with the terms of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Goldberg, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent form(s), attached hereto as Appendix "C" and Appendix "D",
                        respectively. 
                  
            (10)  I, Dr. Goldberg, undertake to comply with the terms and conditions of
                  this Undertaking and acknowledge that a breach by me of any term of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (11)  I, Dr. Goldberg, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of the Undertaking.

            (12)  I, Dr. Goldberg, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for
                  payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the terms of this Undertaking. 

            (13)  I, Dr. Goldberg, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand
                  the terms and conditions provided in this Undertaking and that I have
                  obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this
                  Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

            (14)  I, Dr. Goldberg, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes
                  terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for
                  the purposes of section 23 of the Health Professions Procedural Code,
                  which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O.
                  1991, c. 18, as amended. I understand that this Undertaking shall be
                  information on the College's Register that is available to the public
                  during the time period that the Undertaking remains in effect.

            (15)  I, Dr. Goldberg, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on
                  the College's Register that is available to the public during the time
                  period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                        Dr. Goldberg has been the subject of a College investigation
                        regarding his family practice, with a focus upon his prescribing.
                        As a result of the investigation:
                  
                              Dr. Goldberg will practice under the guidance of a Clinical
                              Supervisor acceptable to the College for twelve (12) months. 
                  
                              Dr. Goldberg will engage in professional education.
                  
                              Dr. Goldberg's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                              selected by the College at the end of the period of
                              supervision.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (16)  I, Dr. Goldberg, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  the following information to any person who requires this information for
                  the purposes of facilitating my completion of the professional education
                  set out in paragraph B(9) above and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or
                  Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (17)  I, Dr. Goldberg, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  this Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities approved by the College, at any hospital or Practice
                  Location where I practice or have privileges ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and
                  to provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has
                  that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or
                  any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

            (18)  I, Dr. Goldberg, give my irrevocable consent to any person who
                  facilitates my completion of the professional education pursuant to this
                  Undertaking, and to all Clinical Supervisors, Chief(s) of Staff and
                  Assessors, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any
                  information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the terms of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking set
                        out at Appendix "A";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   which comes to his or her attention in the course of providing the
                        education set out above and which he or she reasonably believes
                        indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: May 16, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Norman Victor Goldberg to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 16, 2016:

Dr. Goldberg has been the subject of a College investigation regarding his family practice, with a focus upon his prescribing. As a result of the investigation:

• Dr. Goldberg will practice under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for twelve (12) months.

• Dr. Goldberg will engage in professional education.

• Dr. Goldberg’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College at the end of the period of supervision.