Goldman, Gerald Norton (CPSO#: 22369)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Sep 1969

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 14 Jul 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 13
20 Steelcase Road West
Markham ON  L3R 1B2
Phone: (416) 499-1617
Fax: (905) 415-2005
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

6482 Bloomington Sideroad
Stouffville ON  L3R 1B2
Canada
Phone: 905-203-2777
Fax: 416-352-5931
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1969
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 03 Aug 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 03 Aug 2016 Active View Details [+]
            As from August 3, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Gerald Norton
            Goldman, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Goldman to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  As of August 31, 2016, Dr. Goldman practice is restricted to addiction
                  medicine, and he may no longer practice family medicine.