Goldman, Russell David (CPSO#: 66463)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Temmy Latner Centre
Mount Sinai Hospital
60 Murray Street
4th Floor, Box #13
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 6149
Fax: (416) 586-4804
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Russell Goldman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 17 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Goldman ( CPSO# 66463 )

Business Address:
Temmy Latner Centre
Mount Sinai Hospital
4th Floor Box 13
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RUSSELL DAVID GOLDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1995