Goldstein, Jeffrey Lee (CPSO#: 81519)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
379 Church St. Unit 404A
Markham ON  L6B 0T1
Phone: (905) 471-1444
Fax: 905-471-1777
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 200 491 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M4N 1A8
Canada
Phone: 416-782-6111 Ext. 121
Fax: 416-782-5515
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Irwin H. Goldstein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Goldstein ( CPSO# 25743 )
Dr. J. Goldstein ( CPSO# 81519 )

Business Address:
Suite 103 - 105
2101 Brimley Road
Toronto ON  M1S 2B4
Phone Number: (416) 297-7400


Corporation Name: J.L. Goldstein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 29 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Goldstein ( CPSO# 81519 )

Business Address:
Suite 200
491 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M4N 1A8
Phone Number: (416) 782-6111

Business Address:
404A - 379 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 0T1
Phone Number: (905) 471-1444

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 23 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY LEE GOLDSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2008