Golisky, Jeffrey Mark (CPSO#: 81015)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Huronia Medical Centre
Suite 103 P O Box 790
240 Old Penetanguishene Road
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Phone: (705) 526-7956
Fax: (705) 526-6287
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Georgian Bay General Hospital
1112 St. Andrew's Drive
Midland ON  L4R4P4
Canada
Phone: 705 526 1300 Ext. 1501
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jeffrey M. Golisky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 29 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Golisky ( CPSO# 81015 )

Business Address:
Huronia Medical Centre
Suite 103
240 Old Penetanguishene Road
PO BOX 790
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Phone Number: (705) 526-7956

Business Address:
1112 St Andrew's Drive
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Phone Number: (705) 526-1300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY MARK GOLISKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLISKY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2006