Golubov, Jordan (CPSO#: 55728)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Sep 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 203
585 Queen Street South
Kitchener ON  N2G 4S4
Phone: (519) 744-9389
Fax: (519) 744-8976
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jordan Golubov Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 13 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Golubov ( CPSO# 55728 )
Dr. M. Jackson ( CPSO# 61142 )

Business Address:
Suite 203
585 Queen Street South
Kitchener ON  N2G 4S4
Phone Number: (519) 744-9389

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 20 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JORDAN GOLUBOV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLUBOV is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1987