Goodhew, Rick Thomas (CPSO#: 66522)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Thomas Family Care Centre
Unit 50
1063 Talbot Street
St Thomas ON  N5P 1G4
Phone: (519) 631-8460
Fax: (519) 631-2633
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rick Goodhew Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 12 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Goodhew ( CPSO# 66522 )

Business Address:
St. Thomas Family Care Centre
Suite 50
1063 Talbot Street
St Thomas ON  N5P 1G4
Phone Number: (519) 631-8460

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICK THOMAS GOODHEW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOODHEW is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1995