Goodman, Shaun Geoffrey (CPSO#: 58018)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Apr 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
Room 6-034 Donnelly Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5722
Fax: (416) 864-5407
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Heart Centre
Suite 906
2300 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4P 1E4
Canada
Phone: (647) 776-2500
Fax: (647) 260-0279
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 24 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAUN GEOFFREY GOODMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOODMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 1989