Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Goossens, Jan Barry (CPSO#: 59260)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Sep 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 204
348 Muskoka Road 3 North
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H8
Phone: (705) 789-1268
Fax: 705-789-9698
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jan Goossens Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 06 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Goossens ( CPSO# 59260 )

Business Address:
Suite 204
348 Muskoka Road 3 North
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H8
Phone Number: (705) 789-1268

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAN BARRY GOOSSENS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOOSSENS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2011