Gopinathan, Asha (CPSO#: 76304)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Mar 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Mar 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Kerala, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Welland County General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
65 Third Street
Welland ON  L3B 4W6
Phone: (905) 732-6111 Ext. 33375
Fax: (905) 732-2651
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Asha Gopinathan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 03 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gopinathan ( CPSO# 76304 )

Business Address:
Niagara Health System
Welland Hospital Site
65 Third Street
Welland ON  L3B 4W6
Phone Number: (905) 732-6111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jan 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASHA GOPINATHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOPINATHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Apr 2002
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 May 2002 to 31 Oct 2002
International Specialist Physician - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 May 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2002
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 18 Nov 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 18 Nov 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 18 Nov 2007
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 23 Feb 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2008