Gora, Michael Aaron (CPSO#: 86351)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Gora Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 27 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: South Bruce Grey Health Center Kincardine, ON N2Z 1G6
Date Received: 05 May 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2015 to 30 Nov 2015
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017