Gorczynski, Reginald Mieczyslaw (CPSO#: 61102)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 08 Jul 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
429 Drewry Avenue
Willowdale ON  M2R 2K6
Phone: (416) 229-9739
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

MCI The Doctor's Office
3869 Jane Street
Toronto ON  M3N2K1
Canada
Phone: (416) 6367077
Fax: (416) 6350562
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Reg Gorczynski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Gorczynski ( CPSO# 61102 )

Business Address:
MCI The Doctors Office
3869 Jane Street
Downsview ON  M3N 2K1
Phone Number: (416) 636-7077

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2007
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 08 Jul 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 08 Jul 2016 Active View Details [+]
            As from July 8, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Reginald Mieczyslaw
            Gorczynski, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr.
            Gorczynski to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. REGINALD M. GORCZYNSKI
                                          ("Dr. Gorczynski")
                  
                                                to
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010,
                  S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Gorczynski, certificate of registration number 61102, am a member
                  of the College.  The College has received information regarding my
                  standard of practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Gorczynski, acknowledge that I am currently the subject of a
                  College investigation bearing File Number 7214752 (the "Investigation")
                  into concerns about my prescribing practices.

            (4)   I, Dr. Gorczynski, acknowledge that, in conjunction with an in-person
                  caution regarding the treatment of a family member in contravention of
                  the College policy on Treating Self and Family Members, upon receiving an
                  original copy of this Undertaking as signed by me, the College has agreed
                  to take no further action on the Investigation.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   Resignation of Prescribing Privileges   

                  (a)   I, Dr. Gorczynski, acknowledge that I have executed the Voluntary
                        Resignation of Prescribing Privileges Form, which is attached
                        hereto as Schedule "A" (the "Resignation Letter") and forms part of
                        this Undertaking.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Gorczynski, undertake and agree that I will not issue new
                        prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for any of the
                        following substances:
                  
                        (i)   Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
                              under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c.
                              19);
                        (ii)  Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
                              made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C.,
                              1996, c. 19);
                        (iii) Controlled Drugs (from Schedule G of the Regulations under
                              the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27); 
                        (iv)  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the
                              Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations
                              made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C.,
                              1996, c. 19); 
                  
                        (A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the
                        Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached hereto
                        as Schedule "B"; and the current regulatory lists are attached
                        hereto as Schedule "C")
                  
                        (v)   All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics
                              Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22 as noted in
                              Schedule "D");                       
                  
                        and as amended from time to time.
                  
            (6)   I, Dr. Gorczynski, undertake to provide the executed Resignation Letter
                  to Health Canada, and to provide proof of same to the College, within 15
                  days of executing this Undertaking.

            (7)   I, Dr. Gorczynski, undertake that I will return any supplies of the
                  substances referred to in section (5)(b) above that are presently in my
                  possession, in any place, to a pharmacy in a safe and secure manner, as
                  stipulated in the College's Policy Number 8-12, "Prescribing Drugs."

            (8)   I, Dr. Gorczynski, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                  location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited
                  to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction
                  (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within fifteen (15) days of
                  executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake to inform
                  the College of any and all new Practice Locations within fifteen (15)
                  days of commencing practice at that location.

            (9)   Posting a Sign 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Gorczynski, undertake that effective immediately I shall
                        post a sign in the waiting room(s) of all my Practice Locations, in
                        a clearly visible and secure location, in the form set out at
                        Schedule "E." For further clarity, this sign shall state as
                        follows: 
                  
                                    IMPORTANT NOTICE
                  
                        Dr. Gorczynski must not prescribe any of the following: 
                        -     Narcotic Drugs
                        -     Narcotic Preparations
                        -     Controlled Drugs
                        -     Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
                        -     All other Monitored Drugs
                  
                        Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and
                        Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Gorczynski, undertake to post a certified translation in any
                        language in which I provide services, of the sign described in
                        section (9)(a) above, in the waiting room(s) of all my Practice
                        Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form
                        set out at Schedule "E." 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Gorczynski, undertake to provide the certified
                        translation(s) described in section (9)(b), to the College within
                        thirty (30) days of executing this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Gorczynski, undertake that if I elect, after the execution
                        of this Undertaking, to provide services in any other language(s),
                        I will notify the College prior to providing any such services. 
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Gorczynski, undertake to provide to the College the
                        certified translation(s) described in section (9)(c) prior to
                        beginning to provide services in the language(s) described in
                        section (9)(d).
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (10)  I, Dr. Gorczynski, acknowledge that all schedules attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. Gorczynski, acknowledge and agree that I am bound by this
                  Undertaking from the date on which I sign it.

            (12)  I, Dr. Gorczynski, undertake to abide by the terms and conditions of this
                  Undertaking. I acknowledge that a breach of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the
                  Discipline Committee of the College.

            (13)  I, Dr. Gorczynski, acknowledge and agree that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking.

            (14)  I, Dr. Gorczynski, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and
                  understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained
                  independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or
                  have waived my right to do so.

            (15)  I, Dr. Gorczynski, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes
                  terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for
                  the purposes of section 23 of the Code. I understand that this
                  Undertaking shall be information on the College's Register that is
                  available to the public during the time period that the Undertaking
                  remains in effect.

            (16)  I, Dr. Gorczynski, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on
                  the College's Register that is available to the public during the time
                  period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                        Dr. Gorczynski was the subject of a College investigation into his
                        prescribing practices. As a result of the investigation, Dr.
                        Gorczynski must not issue new prescriptions or renew existing
                        prescriptions for any of the following substances:
                  
                        (i)   Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
                              under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c.
                              19);
                        (ii)  Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
                              made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C.,
                              1996, c. 19);
                        (iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug
                              Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c.
                              F-27); 
                        (iv)  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the
                              Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations
                              made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C.,
                              1996, c. 19); 
                        (v)   All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics
                              Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22);    

                        and as amended from time to time.
                  
                  Dr. Gorczynski must post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms of
                  all his Practice Locations, which states as follows: 
                  
                                    IMPORTANT NOTICE
                  
                        Dr. Gorczynski must not prescribe any of the following: 
                        -     Narcotic Drugs
                        -     Narcotic Preparations
                        -     Controlled Drugs
                        -     Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
                        -     All other Monitored Drugs
                  
                        Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and
                        Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (17)  I, Dr. Gorczynski, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                  interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s) and
                  patient charts by the College and to any other activity the College deems
                  necessary in order to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                  Undertaking.

            (18)  I, Dr. Gorczynski, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS, and any person who or institution
                  that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor
                  my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (19)  I, Dr. Gorczynski, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                  consent forms, attached hereto as Schedule "F" and Schedule "G",
                  respectively.

            (20)  I, Dr. Gorczynski, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  this Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague(s) with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to
                  provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that
                  led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: August 17, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: Member
Active Date: July 8, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Reginald Mieczyslaw Gorczynski to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 8, 2016:

Dr. Gorczynski was the subject of a College investigation into his prescribing practices. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Gorczynski must not issue new prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for any of the following substances:

(i) Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);

(ii) Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);

(iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27);

(iv) Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19);

(v) All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22);

and as amended from time to time.

Dr. Gorczynski must post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms of all his Practice Locations, which states as follows:

IMPORTANT NOTICE

Dr. Gorczynski must not prescribe any of the following:

- Narcotic Drugs
- Narcotic Preparations
- Controlled Drugs
- Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
- All other Monitored Drugs

Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca