Gorja, Juliana (CPSO#: 83903)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jan 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jan 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Albanian, English, Italian

Education:Universiteti i Tiranes, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10 Mallard Road
C105, C106
North York ON  M3B 0A7
Phone: (647) 351-5955
Fax: (647) 351-5958
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Juliana Gorja Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Gorja ( CPSO# 83903 )

Business Address:
10 Mallard Road
Suite C105
Toronto ON  M3B 0A7
Phone Number: (647) 351-5955

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIANA GORJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GORJA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2006 to 13 Mar 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 14 Mar 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2008