Goss, Glenwood Dillon (CPSO#: 56446)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Nov 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jul 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Cancer Centre
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-7700 Ext. 73955
Fax: (613) 247-3511
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Glen Goss Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 12 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Goss ( CPSO# 56446 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
Cancer Centre
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-7700

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

South Africa

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 08 Sep 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GLENWOOD DILLON GOSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOSS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 1985
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Nov 1985
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 26 Nov 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1986