Gotesman, Galina (CPSO#: 62249)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:University of Ottawa, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 402
4430 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M3H 3S3
Phone: 416-226-5510
Fax: 416-226-5545
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Baycrest Centre for Geriatric Care
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M6A 2E1
Canada
Phone: (416) 785-2500 Ext. 2636
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Galina Gotesman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Gotesman ( CPSO# 62249 )

Business Address:
402 - 4430 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M3H 3S3
Phone Number: (416) 226-5510

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 28 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GALINA GOTESMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOTESMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 14 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Dec 1993
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1991