Gott, William James (CPSO#: 99447)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
55 Isla Street
Markdale ON  N0C 1H0
Phone: (519) 986-3040
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: William Gott Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Gott ( CPSO# 99447 )

Business Address:
55 Isla Street
PO Box 406
Markdale ON  N0C 1H0
Phone Number: (519) 986-3040

Business Address:
74 Front Street East
Strathroy ON  N7G 1Y7

Business Address:
29 Noxon Street
Ingersoll ON  N5C 3V6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Grey Bruce Health Services,Markdale Site Markdale
Seaforth Community Hospital Seaforth

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 10 Oct 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM JAMES GOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOTT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 26 Sep 2012 to 23 Oct 2012
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

University of Toronto, 11 Apr 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2013