Gould, Michael Irwin (CPSO#: 55727)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Aug 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4600 Highway 7 W.
Suite 250
Vaughan ON  L4L 4Y7
Phone: (905) 605-3884
Fax: (416) 745-3653
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

4610 Highway 7 ste 200
Vaughan ON  L4L 4Y7
Canada
Phone: (905) 856-2626
Fax: (905) 856-2602
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

4600 Highway #7 ste 250
Vaughan ON  L4L 4Y7
Canada
Phone: (416) 745-9994
Fax: (416) 745-3653
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Gould Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 25 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gould ( CPSO# 55727 )

Business Address:
222 - 89 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9V 4B8
Phone Number: (416) 745-9994

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 20 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL IRWIN GOULD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOULD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1986