Gow, Robert Malcolm (CPSO#: 50772)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Dec 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Dec 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Queensland, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Cardiology
Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 3257
Fax: (613) 738-4835
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

University of Ottawa
Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Canada
Phone: (613) 761-5000
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. M. Gow Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 24 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Gow ( CPSO# 50772 )

Business Address:
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 767-5000

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Division of Cardiology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
University of Ottawa,Heart Institute Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 16 Oct 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 16 Oct 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT MALCOLM GOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOW is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1985
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 13 Jan 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Dec 1988