Gowda, Shruthi Manjunatha (CPSO#: 89933)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jan 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jan 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Kannada

Education:Bangalore University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10220 DERRY ROAD
SUITE 105 B
Milton ON  L9T 7J3
Phone: (905) 875-3369
Fax: (905) 878-0435
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

7070 McLaughlin Road
Unit F1
Mississauga ON  L5W 1W7
Canada
Phone: (905) 795-2873
Fax: (905) 795-9118
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shruthi M. Gowda Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gowda ( CPSO# 89933 )

Business Address:
10220 Derry Road
Suite 105 B
Milton ON  L9T 7J3
Phone Number: (905) 875-3369

Business Address:
F1 - 7070 McLaughlin Road
Mississauga ON  L5W 1W7
Phone Number: (905) 795-2873

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHRUTHI MANJUNATHA GOWDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOWDA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 21 Oct 2008 to 12 Jan 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 13 Jan 2009 to 20 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 21 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 13 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2011