Grabowski, Arthur Christopher (CPSO#: 72313)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 300
95 Bayly Street West
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone: (905) 426-9426
Fax: (905) 426-9322
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Arthur C. Grabowski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 09 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Grabowski ( CPSO# 72313 )

Business Address:
Suite 300
95 Bayly Street West
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone Number: (905) 426-9426

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARTHUR CHRISTOPHER GRABOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRABOWSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Aug 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003