Grace, Douglas (CPSO#: 71731)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
481 John Street
Burlington ON  L7R 2K8
Phone: (905) 336-9636
Fax: (905) 336-9651
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Grace Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 15 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Grace ( CPSO# 71731 )

Business Address:
The Grace Clinic Plastic, Reconstructive & Cosmeti
200 - 481 John Street
Burlington ON  L7R 2K8
Phone Number: (905) 336-9636

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOUGLAS GRACE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRACE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Nov 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002