Graham, Caroline Hart (CPSO#: 60958)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 23 Mar 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 400
3910 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M3H 5Z3
Phone: (416) 638-6107
Fax: (416) 638-9484
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Caroline Graham Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Graham ( CPSO# 60958 )

Business Address:
Suite 400
3910 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M3H 5Z3
Phone Number: (416) 638-6107

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Clinical Immunology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Clinical Immunology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 1991
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Mar 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 23 Mar 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 23 Mar 2011 Active View Details [+]
            As  from  March  23,  2011,  the  following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Caroline Hart Graham,
            in accordance with an undertaking and  consent  given  by  Dr.  Graham  to  the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Caroline Hart Graham has relinquished her prescribing privileges with
                  respect  to  the  following drugs, substances and preparations set out in
                  the  corresponding  regulations,  as  amended  from  time  to  time,  and
                  summarized as follows:
                  
                  
            Drug/Substance                      Relinquished          Not Relinquished

            Narcotic Drugs
            (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
             made under the Controlled Drugs
             and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)    X

            Narcotic Preparations
            (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
             made under the Controlled Drugs
             and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)    X

            Controlled Drugs
            (from Schedule G of the Regulations
             under the Food and Drugs
             Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27)                             X

            Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances
            (from the Benzodiazepines and Other 
            Targeted Substances Regulations made 
            under the Controlled Drugs and 
            Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19)                    X