Graham, Janice Susan (CPSO#: 67155)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 809
123 Edward Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Phone: (416) 962-7777
Fax: (416) 962-7767
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Lyndhurst Centre, UHN
520 Sutherland Drive
Toronto ON  M4G 3V9
Canada
Phone: (416) 597-3422 Ext. 6216
Fax: (416) 422-1981
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

U of T Health & Wellness
214 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2Z9
Canada
Phone: (416) 978-8030 Ext. 0
Fax: (416) 971-2089
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Lyndhurst Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 08 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANICE SUSAN GRAHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRAHAM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 05 Jul 1994
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 06 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Nov 1996
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1997