Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Graham, Susan Frances Bishop (CPSO#: 59328)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jan 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Delhi Family Health Team
105 Main Street of Delhi
Delhi ON  N4B 2L8
Phone: (519) 582-2323 Ext. 223
Fax: (519) 582-1513
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Norfolk General Hospital
365 West Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1T7
Canada
Phone: 519-429-2410
County: Regional Municipality of Haldimand-Norfolk
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Susan B. Graham Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 11 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Graham ( CPSO# 59328 )

Business Address:
365 West Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1T7
Phone Number: (519) 426-0750

Business Address:
Delhi Family Health Team
105 Main Street of Delhi
Delhi ON  N4B 2L8
Phone Number: (519) 582-2323

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN FRANCES BISHOP GRAHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRAHAM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 1990