Grant, Anna Lee (CPSO#: 88258)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Maple Clinic
Unit D2
1036 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1H2
Phone: (613) 546-9721
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Grant & Grant Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 12 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Grant ( CPSO# 88479 )
Dr. A. Grant ( CPSO# 88258 )

Business Address:
Maple Key Clinic
Unit D2
1036 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1H2
Phone Number: (613) 546-9721

Business Address:
QHC Belleville General Hospital
Department of Anesthesiology
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400

Business Address:
Queen's School of Medicine
18 Barrie Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone Number: (613) 533-2544

Business Address:
Prince Edward County Memorial
403 Main Street
Picton ON  K0K 2T0
Phone Number: (613) 476-1008

Business Address:
K.O.P.I.
Suite 500
797 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1G1
Phone Number: (613) 344-1202

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNA LEE GRANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRANT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 05 May 2008 to 14 May 2008
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 May 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 May 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008