Granton, John Thomas (CPSO#: 58005)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
585 University Avenue
11 Munk 124
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-4485
Fax: (416) 340-3359
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John Granton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 30 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Granton ( CPSO# 58005 )

Business Address:
585 University Avenue
MUNK 11-124
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 340-4485

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick
Newfoundland and Labrador
Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 16 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN THOMAS GRANTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRANTON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1989