Graves, Peter Stephen (CPSO#: 63570)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Nepean ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-4710
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Graves / Heather Dennison Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Graves ( CPSO# 63570 )
Dr. H. Dennison ( CPSO# 62729 )

Business Address:
Carlington Community and Health Services
900 Merivale Road
Ottawa ON  K1Z 5Z8
Phone Number: (613) 722-3849

Business Address:
Emergency Department
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-4710

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 05 Dec 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER STEPHEN GRAVES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRAVES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1992